Parai, Sushil Kumar (CPSO#: 63388)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Dacca Medical College, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 11 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013