Paranjothy, Suresh (CPSO#: 87978)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2008 to 16 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2008 to 02 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jan 2009