Parbhakar, Meenakshi (CPSO#: 79810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1160 beaverwood road
Ottawa ON  K4M 1A3
Phone: (613)692-0244
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Parbhakar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Parbhakar ( CPSO# 79810 )

Business Address:
2130 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 5Z1
Phone Number: (613) 898-7503

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEENAKSHI PARBHAKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARBHAKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005