Pardis, Bijan (CPSO#: 68742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Apr 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Persian

Education:University of Brussels, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
28 Langstaff Road East
Markham ON  L3T 3P8
Phone: (905) 709-9955
Fax: (905) 709-4138
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

199 CHURCH STREET
BASEMENT UNIT
Toronto ON  M5B 1Y7
Canada
Phone: 4162477777
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4972 DUNDAS STREET WEST
Etobicoke ON  M9A 1B7
Canada
Phone: 4162367924
Fax: 4162367926
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1261 KENNEDY RD
UNIT B2
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L4
Canada
Phone: (416) 490-0499
Fax: (416) 490-1870
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

348 LAKESHORE RD E
UNIT 1
Mississauga ON  L4G 1H5
Canada
Phone: (905) 891-2345
Fax: 905 891 8780
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pardis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Pardis ( CPSO# 68742 )

Business Address:
28 Langstaff Road East
Markham ON  L3T 3P8

Business Address:
4972 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9A 1B7

Business Address:
Suite B2
1261 kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L4

Business Address:
Suite 01
348 Lakeshore Road East
Mississauga ON  L5G 1H5

Business Address:
Basement Floor
199 Church Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1Y7
Phone Number: (416) 419-2900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:00 p.m., March 8, 2017, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Bijan Pardis:

            Clinical Supervision 

            (a)   Dr. Pardis shall retain a clinical supervisor, approved by the College,
                  who will sign an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Appendix "A"
                  (the "Clinical Supervisor"), to be returned to the College in executed
                  form no later than seven (7) days after the date of this Order.  Dr.
                  Pardis shall practise with respect to his methadone practice under the
                  guidance of the Clinical Supervisor for a period of three (3) months,
                  during which time the Clinical Supervisor will at minimum review at least
                  ten (10) of Dr. Pardis' patient charts from his methadone practice once
                  every month, to be selected independently by the Clinical Supervisor.
                  Dr. Pardis shall meet with the Clinical Supervisor at least once every
                  month at his Practice Location or another location approved by the
                  College to discuss any concerns related to patient care and/or arising
                  from the Clinical Supervisor's chart review. Dr. Pardis shall cooperate
                  fully with the Clinical Supervisor and shall abide by the recommendations
                  of the Clinical Supervisor, including, but not limited to, any
                  recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development. 

            (b)   If a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Order is
                  unable or unwilling to continue to fulfil its provisions, Dr. Pardis
                  shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an
                  executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person
                  who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                  College within that time.

            (c)   If Dr. Pardis is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions
                  set out under paragraphs 3(a) and/or (b) above, Dr. Pardis shall cease
                  practising medicine until such time as he has obtained a Clinical
                  Supervisor acceptable to the College. If he is required to cease
                  practising medicine as a result of the application of this term of this
                  Order, this requirement shall constitute a term, condition or limitation
                  on his certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation
                  will be included on the College's public register. 

            Reassessment

            (d)   Within approximately six (6) months after the completion of the period of
                  Clinical Supervision referred to above in paragraph 3(a), Dr. Pardis will
                  submit to a reassessment of his methadone practice (the "First
                  Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the
                  "Assessor(s)").  The Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                  observation of Dr. Pardis' care, interviews with colleagues and
                  co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary
                  by the College. The First Reassessment shall be at Dr. Pardis' expense
                  and he shall co-operate fully with all elements of the First
                  Reassessment. Dr. Pardis shall abide by all recommendations made by the
                  Assessor(s) subject to paragraph (f) below, and the results of the First
                  Reassessment will be reported to the College and may form the basis of
                  further action by the College.

            (e)   Within approximately twelve (12) months after the completion of the
                  process of the First Reassessment, Dr. Pardis will submit to a further
                  reassessment of his methadone practice (the "Second Reassessment") by an
                  assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  The
                  Second Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of Dr.
                  Pardis' care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                  patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.  The Second
                  Reassessment shall be at Dr. Pardis' expense and he shall co-operate
                  fully with all elements of the Second Reassessment. Dr. Pardis shall
                  abide by all recommendations made by the Assessor(s) subject to paragraph
                  (f) below, and the results of the Second Reassessment will be reported to
                  the College and may form the basis of further action by the College.

            (f)   If after either the First or Second Reassessment, Dr. Pardis is of the
                  view that any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, he
                  will have fifteen (15) days following his receipt of the recommendations
                  within which to provide the College with his submissions in this regard.
                  The Inquiries Complaints and Reports ("ICR") Committee will consider
                  those submissions and make a determination regarding whether the
                  recommendations are reasonable, and that decision will be provided to Dr.
                  Pardis. Following that decision, Dr. Pardis will abide by those
                  recommendations of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined
                  are reasonable.  Any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                  conditions or limitations on Dr. Pardis' practice and any recommendations
                  of the Assessor(s) which the ICR Committee has identified in its
                  decision(s) referenced in this term of this Order shall be terms,
                  conditions or limitations on Dr. Pardis' practice, to be included on the
                  College's public register.

            Other

            (g)   Dr. Pardis shall inform the College of each and every location where he
                  practices, in any jurisdiction (his "Practice Location(s)") within seven
                  (7) days of this Order, and shall inform the College of any and all new
                  Practice Locations within seven (7) days of commencing practice at that
                  location, until the report of the assessment of his practice have been
                  reported to the College.

            (h)   Dr. Pardis shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his Practice Location(s) and and to any other activity the
                  College deems necessary in order to monitor his compliance with the
                  provisions of this Order. 

            (i)   Dr. Pardis shall give his irrevocable consent to the College making
                  appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, the Drug
                  Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented
                  under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, and/or any person who
                  or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                  College to monitor his compliance with this Order.

            (j)   Dr. Pardis shall give his irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to all Clinical Supervisors and/or Assessors:

                  a.    Any information the College has that led to the circumstances of
                        this Order;
                  b.    Any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, Dr. Pardis' practice; 
                  c.    Any information arising from the monitoring of his compliance with
                        this Order or of any Undertaking to the College into which he has
                        entered. 
                  
            (k)   Dr. Pardis shall give his irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors
                  and Assessors to disclose to the College and to one another any
                  information:

                  a.    Relevant to this Order or to any Undertaking to the College into
                        which he has entered, including but not limited to his compliance
                        with the same;
                  b.    Relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Order;
                  c.    Relevant to the First or Second Reassessment; and/or
                  d.    Which comes to their attention in the course of their duties under
                        this Order and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential
                        risk of harm to his patients. 
                  
            (l)   Dr. Pardis shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with
                  implementing the terms of this Order.

            As from March 8, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Bijan Pardis, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Pardis to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                                                of
                                          DR. BIJAN PARDIS
                                          ("Dr. Pardis")
                                                to
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Pardis, certificate of registration number 68742, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that the College referred allegations of
                  professional misconduct regarding my family practice and my methadone
                  practice to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated March
                  23, 2016 (the "Notice of Hearing").

            (4)   I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that I have not practised family medicine
                  since April 24, 2016 pending the hearing before the Discipline Committee
                  regarding the allegations against me.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective March 8, 2017 at 12:01 a.m.

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake that I will not engage in the practice of
                        family medicine.
                  
            (7)   Notification of Patients and Communication with Family Physicians

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake that I shall advise each of my current
                        patients at his or her next appointment, and each new or returning
                        patient in future, in writing, that:
                  
                        i.    I cannot act as their family physician or provide any family
                              medicine services to them;
                        ii.   I advise them to have a family physician and ask them to
                              provide me with their family physician's contact information;
                              and
                        iii.  It is desirable that I be able to communicate with their
                              family physician for the purpose of providing health care and
                              ensuring that the family physician, who is in their circle of
                              care, is aware of my treatment and receives relevant
                              information.    
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake that in each patient's chart I will
                        maintain a copy of the written notification(s) that I have provided
                        to that patient as described in section 7(a) above and signed by
                        the patient, and that I will maintain in the patient's chart any
                        information with which I or my staff is provided regarding the
                        identity and contact information of each patient's family
                        physician. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake that if a patient withholds, withdraws, or
                        limits consent for me to communicate with their family physician, I
                        will maintain a record of it in the patient's chart and will note
                        that I have informed the patient that it is desirable that family
                        physicians be aware of all treatments a patient is receiving. I
                        further acknowledge that I will comply with the College's Policy
                        regarding Confidentiality of Personal Health Information (#8-05),
                        as amended from time to time. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake that, subject to section 7(c) above, I
                        shall communicate to each patient's family physician any
                        information that is reasonably necessary for providing care,
                        including relevant test results.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Dr. Pardis, undertake that I shall post a sign in the
                        waiting room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible
                        and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "A."  For
                        further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Pardis must
                        not practise family medicine. Further information may be found on
                        the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                        www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section 7 (e) in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice Locations,
                        in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Appendix "A." 
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake that if I provide service in any
                        language(s) other than English to a patient to whom I am providing
                        written notice under section 7(a) above, I will provide such notice
                        in a certified translation in the language in which I provide
                        service to the patient. 
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in sections 7(f) and (g), to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section 7(f) and (g) prior to beginning
                        to provide services in the language(s) described in section 7(i).
                  
            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pardis, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pardis, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pardis, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Allegations of professional misconduct regarding Dr. Pardis were
                        referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. As a result,
                        Dr. Pardis must not practise family medicine.
                  
                        Dr. Pardis must notify each patient in his practice in writing
                        that:
                              1.    He cannot act as their family physician or provide any
                                    family medicine services to them;
                              2.    He advises them to have a family physician and asks
                                    them to provide him with their family physician's
                                    contact information; and
                              3.    It is desirable that he be able to communicate with
                                    their family physician for the purpose of providing
                                    health care and ensuring that the family physician, who
                                    is in their circle of care, is aware of his treatment
                                    and receives relevant information.
                  
                        Dr. Pardis must communicate to each patient's family physician any
                        information that is reasonably necessary for providing care,
                        including relevant test results, subject to any limit placed by the
                        patient on his doing so. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Pardis, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Mar 2017
Summary:

On  March  8,  2017,  the  Discipline  Committee  found that  Dr. Pardis has  committed  an  act  of 
professional misconduct, in  that he has  failed  to  maintain  the  standard  of  practice  of  the 
profession. 

Dr. Pardis is a family physician who practised in the Greater Toronto area, maintaining both a 
family practice and a methadone practice. 
 
Family Practice 
 
In February 2013, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College required Dr. 
Pardis to complete a specified education and remediation program directed at his family practice, 
including coursework, a preceptorship, and a reassessment. The preceptor identified a number of 
concerns with Dr. Pardis’ practice, including a need for better documentation of physician-
patient encounters and to consistently update Cumulative Patient Profiles. The preceptor found 
that Dr. Pardis made improvements in his recordkeeping throughout the course of the 
preceptorship, however, identified a number of specific care concerns, including two cases in 
which symptoms that Dr. Pardis failed to investigate could be due to an underlying malignancy. 
As a result, the College commenced an investigation into Dr. Pardis’ practice. 
 
The medical expert who reviewed Dr. Pardis’ family practice observed that Dr. Pardis’ practice 
consisted primarily of immigrants from Iran, many of whom spent time regularly in Iran while 
also seeing physicians there, and that it was difficult to provide comprehensive coordinated care 
to those patients. He indicated that Dr. Pardis provided care with cultural sensitivity and 
demonstrated knowledge of the circumstances of their lives. However, Dr. Pardis failed to meet 
the standard of practice of the profession. His recordkeeping fell below the standard in most 
caess. He failed to provide preventive care that met the standard of practice in the majority of 
cases. He lacked a coordinated approach to chronic disease management. He did not document; 
weighingthe risks when prescribing non-steroidal anti-inflammatory drugs (“NSAIDs”) to 
patients with cardiovascular risk factors and/or gastrointestinal inflammation and lacked 
knowledge in this regard.. Hedid not take steps to provide renal and vascular protection to 
patients with diabetes. He engaged in over-testing and over-screening, including by ordering 
unnecessary echocardiograms and routine blood and urine testing without justification. He 
overprescribed antibiotics for viral illnesses. He co-ordinated care poorly with consultants 
regarding medication management. 
 
The medical expert found a more immediate risk of harm in four cases, and found that on 
balance that Dr. Pardis’ care was “substandard” and represented a potential risk of harm. 
 
Methadone Practice 
 
As a result of clinical concerns on the part of the College’s Methadone Committee regarding Dr. 
Pardis’ methadone practice and his ongoing deviations from the Methadone Maintenance 
Treatment Guidelines, Dr. Pardis entered into an undertaking on November 9, 2010, by which he 
agreed that his methadone practice would be subject to clinical supervision and would be 
reassessed by a College-appointed assessor. 
The assessor found that Dr. Pardis failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession 
                                      1 

regarding three patients, and in his medical record-keeping, which was so deficient that it was 
not possible to determine in other cases whether his care met the standard of practice of the 
profession. The assessor also noted concerns regarding Dr. Pardis’ prescribing of testosterone 
replacement to methadone patients, specifically appropriate dosage and regular monitoring of the 
same in eight cases. 
 
In response to the assessor’s concerns, Dr. Pardis indicated that he had made changes to his 
practice, including only prescribing medications in his methadone practice that are related to 
methadone treatment and its side effects, seeking to improve his counselling of patients about 
side effects and risks of medications and documenting those discussions, and documenting 
patient counselling. He also advised that he had upgraded his electronic medical recordkeeping 
system to include a methadone module. 
 
College History 
 
In February 2013, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) of the College 
considered a report of an investigation into Dr. Pardis’ family practice, which noted deficiencies 
of care, including in primary prevention. The ICRC ordered Dr. Pardis to undergo a specified 
continuing education or remediation program (“SCERP”), which resulted in the preceptorship 
described above. The ICRC also issued Dr. Pardis a written caution with respect to his record-
keeping, which it described as “very deficient,” and provided him with advice about his practice 
management. 
 
Also in February 2013, the ICRC issued in a public complaint a written caution to Dr. Pardis 
with respect to compliance with the College policy on Ending the Physician-Patient Relationship 
and also practice deficiencies that result in poor patient care, including that: he should not treat 
methadone patients for chronic pain or for other medical problems (i.e. family practice 
concerns); he should ensure better practice management, e.g. assigning appointment times; he 
should ensure his medical record-keeping is in keeping with the expectations set out in the 
College policy on Medical Records.  
 
Dr. Pardis’ Status Pending the Hearing 
 
The ICRC made an interim order on April 12, 2016 under section 37 of the Health Professions 
Procedural Code, pending resolution of the allegations against him, Dr. Pardis was required, 
among other things, to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor acceptable to the 
College in his family medicine practice. On April 15, 2016, Dr. Pardis’ counsel advised that, as 
Dr. Pardis did not expect to be able to find a clinical supervisor for his family practice, he would 
cease practising family medicine as of April 24, 2016. Dr. Pardis has not practised family 
medicine since that date. 
 
Dr. Pardis entered into an interim undertaking regarding his methadone practice pending 
resolution of the allegations against him. Among other things, Dr. Pardis agreed to practise under 
the guidance of a clinical supervisor acceptable to the College in respect of his methadone 
practice. Dr. Pardis practised under the guidance of a clinical supervisor in respect of his 
methadone practice pending the hearing. The clinical supervisor’s reports have been positive. 
                                      2 

 
Dr. Pardis’ Undertaking 
 
Dr. Pardis entered into an undertaking dated March 8, 2017, not to practise family medicine, 
effective immediately. He has agreed to notify each of his methadone patients in writing that he 
cannot act as their family physician or provide primary care, and to advise them that they should 
have their own family physician. Dr. Pardis has undertaken to maintain a record of this 
communication in each patient’s chart and to note in the patient’s chart whether he or she has a 
family physician and, if so, who that is, and to communicate relevant information to each 
patient’s family physician. 
 
Disposition 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered that:  
-  The Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and limitations, effective immediately, 
   on Dr. Pardis’ certificate of registration:  
Clinical Supervision  
(a)   Dr. Pardis shall retain a clinical supervisor, approved by the College, who will sign an 
      undertaking in the form attached hereto as Appendix “A” (the “Clinical Supervisor”), to 
      be returned to the College in executed form no later than seven (7) days after the date of 
      this Order.  Dr. Pardis shall practise with respect to his methadone practice under the 
      guidance of the Clinical Supervisor for a period of three (3) months, during which time 
      the Clinical Supervisor will at minimum review at least ten (10) of Dr. Pardis’ patient 
      charts from his methadone practice once every month, to be selected independently by 
      the Clinical Supervisor.  Dr. Pardis shall meet with the Clinical Supervisor at least once 
      every month at his Practice Location or another location approved by the College to 
      discuss any concerns related to patient care and/or arising from the Clinical Supervisor’s 
      chart review. Dr. Pardis shall cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervisor and shall abide 
      by the recommendations of the Clinical Supervisor, including, but not limited to, any 
      recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.  
(b)   If a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix “A” to this Order is unable or 
      unwilling to continue to fulfil its provisions, Dr. Pardis shall, within twenty (20) days of 
      receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a 
      similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered 
      to the College within that time. 
(c)   If Dr. Pardis is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under 
      paragraphs 3(a) and/or (b) above, Dr. Pardis shall cease practising medicine until such 
      time as he has obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. If he is required 
      to cease practising medicine as a result of the application of this term of this Order, this 
      requirement shall constitute a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of 
      registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the College’s public 
      register.  
Reassessment 
(d)   Within approximately six (6) months after the completion of the period of Clinical 
      Supervision referred to above in paragraph 3(a), Dr. Pardis will submit to a reassessment 
      of his methadone practice (the “First Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors selected 
                                      3 

      by the College (the “Assessor(s)”).  The Reassessment may include a chart review, direct 
      observation of Dr. Pardis’ care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback 
      from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College. The First 
      Reassessment shall be at Dr. Pardis’ expense and he shall co-operate fully with all 
      elements of the First Reassessment. Dr. Pardis shall abide by all recommendations made 
      by the Assessor(s) subject to paragraph (f) below, and the results of the First 
      Reassessment will be reported to the College and may form the basis of further action by 
      the College. 
(e)   Within approximately twelve (12) months after the completion of the process of the First 
      Reassessment, Dr. Pardis will submit to a further reassessment of his methadone practice 
      (the “Second Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the 
      “Assessor(s)”).  The Second Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation 
      of Dr. Pardis’ care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients 
      and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.  The Second Reassessment shall be 
      at Dr. Pardis’ expense and he shall co-operate fully with all elements of the Second 
      Reassessment. Dr. Pardis shall abide by all recommendations made by the Assessor(s) 
      subject to paragraph (f) below, and the results of the Second Reassessment will be 
      reported to the College and may form the basis of further action by the College. 
(f)   If after either the First or Second Reassessment, Dr. Pardis is of the view that any of the 
      Assessor(s)’s recommendations are unreasonable, he will have fifteen (15) days 
      following his receipt of the recommendations within which to provide the College with 
      his submissions in this regard.  The Inquiries Complaints and Reports (“ICR”) 
      Committee will consider those submissions and make a determination regarding whether 
      the recommendations are reasonable, and that decision will be provided to Dr. Pardis. 
      Following that decision, Dr. Pardis will abide by those recommendations of the 
      Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable.  Any 
      recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms, conditions or limitations on Dr. 
      Pardis’ practice and any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR Committee 
      has identified in its decision(s) referenced in this term of this Order shall be terms, 
      conditions or limitations on Dr. Pardis’ practice, to be included on the College’s public 
      register. 
Other 
(g)   Dr. Pardis shall inform the College of each and every location where he practices, in any 
      jurisdiction (his “Practice Location(s)”) within seven (7) days of this Order, and shall 
      inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within seven (7) days of 
      commencing practice at that location, until the report of the assessment of his practice 
      have been reported to the College. 
(h)   Dr. Pardis shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice 
      Location(s) and and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor 
      his compliance with the provisions of this Order.  
(i)   Dr. Pardis shall give his irrevocable consent to the College making appropriate enquiries 
      of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics 
      Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, 
      and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the 
      College to monitor his compliance with this Order. 
                                      4 

(j)   Dr. Pardis shall give his irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following 
      information to all Clinical Supervisors and/or Assessors: 
      a. Any information the College has that led to the circumstances of this Order; 
      b. Any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, Dr. Pardis’ 
         practice;  
      c. Any information arising from the monitoring of his compliance with this Order or of 
         any Undertaking to the College into which he has entered.  
(k)   Dr. Pardis shall give his irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors and Assessors to 
      disclose to the College and to one another any information: 
      a. Relevant to this Order or to any Undertaking to the College into which he has entered, 
         including but not limited to his compliance with the same; 
      b. Relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking set out at 
         Appendix “A” to this Order;  
      c. Relevant to the First or Second Reassessment; and/or 
      d. Which comes to their attention in the course of their duties under this Order and 
         which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to his patients.  
(l)   Dr. Pardis shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the 
      terms of this Order. 
-  Dr. Pardis appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Pardis pay to the College costs in the amount of $5,500.00, within 30 days of the date of 
   this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): March 8, 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Bijan Pardis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 8, 2017:

Allegations of professional misconduct regarding Dr. Pardis were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. As a result, Dr. Pardis must not practise family medicine.

Dr. Pardis must notify each patient in his practice in writing that:
1. He cannot act as their family physician or provide any family medicine services to them;

2. He advises them to have a family physician and asks them to provide him with their family physician’s contact information; and

3. It is desirable that he be able to communicate with their family physician for the purpose of providing health care and ensuring that the family physician, who is in their circle of care, is aware of his treatment and receives relevant information.

Dr. Pardis must communicate to each patient’s family physician any information that is reasonably necessary for providing care, including relevant test results, subject to any limit placed by the patient on his doing so.