Pardy, Natasha Ann (CPSO#: 96593)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2011 to 27 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 24 Sep 2011
Elective Trainee - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2011