Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Pare, Michael Francis (CPSO#: 59766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Apr 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 403
265 Yorkland Boulevard
North York ON  M2J 1S5
Phone: (416) 229-2399 Ext. 120
Fax: (416) 229-9771
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL FRANCIS PARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1990