Pare, Rodolphe Albert (CPSO#: 21431)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008