Parekh, Jaintheelal Mohanlal (CPSO#: 25390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenestone Clinic
3rd Floor
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: (416) 222-1932
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaintheelal Parekh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Parekh ( CPSO# 25390 )
Dr. R. Parekh ( CPSO# 65708 )

Business Address:
5734 Yonge Street
Suite 300
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone Number: (647) 981-8440


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAINTHEELAL MOHANLAL PAREKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAREKH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1972