Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Parent, Jocelyne (CPSO#: 51355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 704
21 Clairtrell Road
Toronto ON  M2N 0G8
Phone: (416) 564-0237
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOCELYNE PARENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARENT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1985