Parent, Josee (CPSO#: 64829)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Oct 1997