Parent, Marc Charles (CPSO#: 72136)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 May 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 May 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Oct 1997 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 May 1998 to 29 May 1998
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 1998