Parent, Marcel Patrice Fernand (CPSO#: 88535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Hospital Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph Community Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
176 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 8N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 821-6638
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Silverlinings Medical Centres
Department of Addiction Medicine
47 Willow Rd
Guelph ON  N1H 1W2
Canada
Phone: (519) 829-2929
Fax: (519) 823-9393
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcel Parent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Parent ( CPSO# 88535 )

Business Address:
47 Willow Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1W2
Phone Number: (519) 838-1262

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCEL PATRICE FERNAND PARENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2010