Parent, Nancie (CPSO#: 85001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301, 450 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P5
Phone: 519-748-6933
Fax: 519-748-9733
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Parent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Parent ( CPSO# 85001 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCIE PARENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2008