Parfrey, Brendan Patrick (CPSO#: 85489)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardiology Consultants
8 Rowan Street
PO Box 23042 RPO Churchill Square
St. John's NL  A1B 4J9
Phone: (709) 726-5311
Fax: (709) 726-1028
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brendan Parfrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 13 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDAN PATRICK PARFREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARFREY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 14 Aug 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Queen's University, 07 May 2007 to 03 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2008