Pariag, Lee Joel Stephen (CPSO#: 99059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
Second Floor
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: 905-721-4321
Fax: 905-721-2574
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1450 HWY 2
Courtice ON  L1E3C3
Canada
Phone: 9057214321
Fax: 9057212574
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

117 King St East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Canada
Phone: 9057214321
Fax: 9057212574
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Pariag Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pariag ( CPSO# 99059 )
Dr. J. Pariag ( CPSO# 81751 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Corporation Name: Dr. Seema Jain and Dr. Lee Joel Pariag Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pariag ( CPSO# 99059 )
Dr. S. Jain ( CPSO# 100290)

Business Address:
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4321

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4321

Business Address:
1450 Durham Regional Road 2
Oshawa ON  L1G 4X7
Phone Number: (905) 721-4321

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEE JOEL STEPHEN PARIAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARIAG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015