Pariente, Gali (CPSO#: 104654)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2016