Parikh, Jay Rajendra (CPSO#: 62687)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003