Parikh, Jaylan Ramanlal (CPSO#: 60694)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Baroda University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 May 2006