Parikh, Munjal Shirish (CPSO#: 54874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Dec 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Dalhousie University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
North York ON  M4A 2V6
Phone: (416) 755-2285
Electoral District: 10

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 06 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Mar 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 Mar 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 14, 2014, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Munjal Shirish
            Parikh, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Parikh to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Parikh has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to
                  the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the
                  corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized
                  as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                             Relinquished      

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)          X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)          X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                             X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)                    X

            Monitored Drugs                            
            (from the Ministry of Health and Long-Term
             Care List of Monitored Drugs)                         X


            As from 11:59 p.m., December 5, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Munjal Shirish Parikh:

                  a)    Dr. Parikh must successfully complete, at his own expense,
                        College-facilitated instruction in Ethics within the next year.  
                  
                  b)    Dr. Parikh must successfully complete, at his own expense,
                        College-facilitated instruction in Understanding Boundaries.
                  
                  c)    Dr. Parikh shall ensure that he has available at all times he sees
                        female patients, a female chaperone to be present during an
                        appointment if a patient so requests.
                  
                  d)    Dr. Parikh shall post a sign in his waiting room and in each of his
                        examination rooms, in clearly visible locations, that states: "A
                        female chaperone is available to all female patients of Dr. Parikh.
                        Please advise the receptionist or Dr. Parikh if you would like to
                        have a chaperone present during your appointment."
                  
                  e)    Dr. Parikh shall ensure that information sheets are available in
                        his waiting room at all times, advising patients that he will
                        ensure that a chaperone is available to female patients, to be in
                        attendance for any visit or part of a visit, if requested.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Dec 2012
Summary:

On December 6, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Munjal Shirish Parikh 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Parikh 
admitted the allegation.  
 
Dr. Parikh is a family physician. After a counselling session with Patient A in 2006, during 
which the patient's difficult situation was discussed, in his examination room, without a 
chaperone present, Dr. Parikh initiated a hug with Patient A. Although Dr. Parikh indicates that 
was a supportive hug, Patient A believed that sexual intent was present. 
 
During 2006, Dr. Parikh gave Patient A sums of cash amounting to approximately $7,000 to 
assist her with her financial difficulties. He also provided Patient A with his cell phone number. 
In 2005 and 2006, Dr. Parikh and Patient A engaged in cell phone contact.  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      the Registrar suspend Dr. Parikh's certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months 
      commencing on December 6, 2012.  
      the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Parikh's 
      certificate of registration:  
            Dr. Parikh must successfully complete, at his own expense, College-facilitated 
            instruction in Ethics within the next year.   
            Dr. Parikh must successfully complete, at his own expense, College-facilitated 
            instruction in Understanding Boundaries. 
            Dr. Parikh shall ensure that he has available at all times he sees female patients, a 
            female chaperone to be present during an appointment if a patient so requests. 
            Dr. Parikh shall post a sign in his waiting room and in each of his examination 
            rooms, in clearly visible locations, that states: "A female chaperone is available to 
            all female patients of Dr. Parikh. Please advise the receptionist or Dr. Parikh if 
            you would like to have a chaperone present during your appointment." 
            Dr. Parikh shall ensure that information sheets are available in his waiting room at 
            all times, advising patients that he will ensure that a chaperone is available to 
            female patients, to be in attendance for any visit or part of a visit, if requested. 
 
      Dr. Parikh attend before this panel to be reprimanded.  
 
      Dr. Parikh pay costs to the College in the amount of $3650.00 within 60 days of the date 
      of this order. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 5, 2012