Parikh, Nimish Udayan (CPSO#: 81458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: Parikh, Nimish Udayan (used until: 05 Feb 2007 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Pune, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone: (613) 267-1500 Ext. 4320
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nimish Parikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Parikh ( CPSO# 81458 )

Business Address:
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Business Address:
Smith Falls and Perth District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 18 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIMISH UDAYAN PARIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 04 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 05 Oct 2004 to 04 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 05 Oct 2005 to 04 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 05 Oct 2006 to 04 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 05 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2010