Parikh, Samir Shirish (CPSO#: 72334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore Medical Group
Suite 502
345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone: (905) 845-4511
Fax: (905) 845-8133
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samir Parikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Parikh ( CPSO# 72334 )

Business Address:
Lakeshore Medical Group
502 - 345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 845-4511

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIR SHIRISH PARIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2000