Parimoo, Sabina Ashraf (CPSO#: 91473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kashmiri, Urdu

Education:Sher-I-Kashmir Institute of Med Sciences, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHERRYCREST MEDICAL CENTER
5 CHERRYCREST DRIVE, UNIT 7
Brampton ON  L6P3W4
Phone: 9059156488
Fax: (905) 9157488
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sabina Parimoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Parimoo ( CPSO# 91473 )

Business Address:
7 - 5 Cherrycrest Drive
Brampton ON  L6P 3W4
Phone Number: (905) 915-6488

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABINA ASHRAF PARIMOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARIMOO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011