Parisi, Joseph Louis (CPSO#: 57300)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2009