Park, Adrian Edward (CPSO#: 58021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anne Arundel Medical Center
2000 Medical Parkway
Annapolis MD  21401
United States
Phone: (443) 481-6699
Fax: (443) 481-6713

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Kentucky
USA - Maryland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAN EDWARD PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1989