Park, Andrew Jong-Won (CPSO#: 83018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Dept of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E1-102
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St. Thomas, ON N5R 5C4
St. Thomas AB  N5R 5C4
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Park Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Park ( CPSO# 83018 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room E1-102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JONG-WON PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2016