Park, Diane Hyun Ju (CPSO#: 90528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chamberlain & Park Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chamberlain ( CPSO# 90485 )
Dr. D. Park ( CPSO# 90528 )

Business Address:
K-W CardioPulmonary Services
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 206
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 741-5252

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Woolwich Community Health Centre
10 Parkside Drive
St Jacobs ON  N0B 2N0
Phone Number: (519) 664-3794

Business Address:
Frederick Walk-In Clinic
19A - 385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone Number: (519) 208-8608

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
Cardiac Rehabilitation Center
50 Bathurst Drive
Unit 1
Waterloo ON  N2V 2C5
Phone Number: (519) 885-9517

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE HYUN JU PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016