Park, Esther Mi-Jung (CPSO#: 66663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20 Edna Avenue
Unit 1
Toronto ON  M6P 1B5
Phone: (416) 532-7612
Fax: (416) 532-6577
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Esther M. Park Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Park ( CPSO# 66663 )

Business Address:
Unit 1 - 20 Edna Avenue
Toronto ON  M6P 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 532-7612

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESTHER MI-JUNG PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998