Park, Hazel Shannon (CPSO#: 58309)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2008