Park, John Chan Young (CPSO#: 61118)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2003