Park, Joseph (CPSO#: 58816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Feb 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
200 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone: (905) 525-8607
Fax: (905) 525-8459
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Anesthesia
McMaster Univeristy
1200 Mains St. W
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 5212100 Ext. 75166
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Park Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Park ( CPSO# 58816 )

Business Address:
301 - 200 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone Number: (905) 525-8607

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Pain Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 Feb 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 1, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Joseph Park, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Park to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. JOSEPH PARK
                                          ("Dr. Park")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICRC" means the Inquiries, Complaints, and Reports Committee of the
            College;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Park, certificate of registration number 58816, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Park, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215756 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my anaesthesiology
                  practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Park, acknowledge that currently practice only at Hamilton Health
                  Sciences, the Michael G. DeGroote Pain Clinic, The Hamilton Clinic, and
                  my own office at 200 James St. S. in Hamilton, Ontario (collectively, my
                  "Practice Locations")

            (5)   I, Dr. Park, acknowledge that I do not practice or have privileges at any
                  practice location, including but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics,
                  offices, and out-of-hospital premises, in any jurisdiction other than
                  those listed in paragraph (4).

            (6)   I, Dr. Park, acknowledge that Hamilton Health Sciences has restricted my
                  hospital privileges, in accordance with the terms set out in the letter
                  from Dr. Susan O'Leary to the College, dated February 23, 2016.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (7)   I, Dr. Park, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (8)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Park, undertake that I shall restrict my clinical
                        anaesthesiology practice to:
                  
                        i.    scheduled surgeries or unscheduled, non-emergent surgeries
                              for patients classified as ASA 1, 2, or 3, in operating rooms
                              at hospitals in which I have privileges, excluding:
                  
                              (i)   urgent and emergent cases;
                  
                              (ii)  cardiac, neuro-surgical, vascular and obstetric cases;
                                    and
                  
                        ii.   academic settings only.
                  
                  (b)   For greater certainty, these restrictions do not apply to my acute
                        and chronic pain management practice.
                  
            (9)   Reports from Chief(s) of Staff

                  (a)   I, Dr. Park, undertake to ensure that the Chief of Anesthesia
                        provides reports to the College in accordance with the undertaking
                        attached hereto as Appendix "A". I have reviewed this undertaking
                        and understand what is required of the Chief of Anesthesia, which
                        includes, without limiting the generality of the foregoing:
                  
                        i.    written reports to the College every three months;
                  
                        ii.   such reports to include information regarding my clinical
                              performance, behaviour, conduct, communications and
                              professionalism;
                  
                        iii.  immediate reporting to the College if he or she has any
                              concerns about my clinical performance, behaviour, conduct,
                              communications and professionalism; including that I am not
                              in compliance with my Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Park, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date that I execute this undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Park, undertake that if any person who has given an
                        undertaking in the form attached as Appendix "A" to this
                        undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its
                        terms, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of
                        same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a
                        similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and
                        ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.
                  
            (10)  Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Park, undertake that should I seek privileges to practice at
                        any other Practice Location, I shall advise the College within five
                        (5) days of making such application, and shall apply at least
                        fourteen (14) days before I plan to practice at that location. I
                        will not practice at any Practice Location (other than those listed
                        in paragraph (4) above) without prior approval of the College. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Park, undertake to ensure that the Chief of Staff, or a
                        colleague with similar responsibilities approved by the College, at
                        any Practice Location where I practice ("Chief(s) of Staff") is
                        made aware of the terms of this Undertaking and acknowledges to the
                        College in writing that he or she has been made so aware.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Park, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            (11)  Variance

                  (a)   I, Dr. Park, undertake and agree that if I intend to vary the terms
                        of this undertaking,  I shall provide at least 60 days' notice to
                        the College of my intention and shall seek formal approval of the
                        ICRC to do so.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Park, undertake that should I seek to vary this undertaking,
                        including to remove the practice restrictions set out above, I
                        shall engage in an appropriate education and remediation program
                        acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Park, acknowledge that in considering my request, the ICRC
                        may, among other things:
                  
                  i.    request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration, including that I
                        may not be the Most Responsible Physician; and
                  
                  ii.   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring or supervision agreement with the College.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Park, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Park, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Park, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Park, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (16)  I, Dr. Park, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Park, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Park, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Park
                              failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession
                              in his anaesthesiology practice. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Park shall limit his clinical anaesthesiology
                                    practice to scheduled surgeries and non-emergent,
                                    unscheduled surgeries, excluding urgent and emergent,
                                    cardiac, neuro-surgical, vascular and obstetric cases;
                  
                              *     Dr. Park shall limit his clinical anaesthesiology
                                    practice to academic settings;
                  
                              *     Dr. Park shall ensure the College receives quarterly
                                    reports from Dr. Park's workplace.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Park, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my compliance with this Undertaking:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice, conduct, care or capacity; and/or
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Park, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any hospital or Practice
                  Location where I practice or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Park, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate                                                        
                  enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have
                  relevant                                                     information,
                  in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of
                  this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Park, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached                                                           hereto
                  as Appendix "B".

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 1, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joseph Park to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 1, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Park failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his anaesthesiology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Park shall limit his clinical anaesthesiology practice to scheduled surgeries and non-emergent, unscheduled surgeries, excluding urgent and emergent, cardiac, neuro-surgical, vascular and obstetric cases;

Dr. Park shall limit his clinical anaesthesiology practice to academic settings;

Dr. Park shall ensure the College receives quarterly reports from Dr. Park’s workplace.