Park, Paul Chan Shik (CPSO#: 79614)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 07 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 08 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 11 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 May 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 2010