Park, Yung James (CPSO#: 55507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1986


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst St.
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: 416-785-2500 Ext. 3137
Fax: 416-675-2378
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y.J. Park Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2006

Dr. Y. Park ( CPSO# 55507 )

Business Address:
Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 15 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. YUNG JAMES PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986