Parker, Christopher Marshall (CPSO#: 74889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Respirology
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-2384
Fax: (613) 549-1459
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Respiratory Services
Suite 105
800 Princess St.
Kingston ON  K7L 5E4
Canada
Phone: 6135447910
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Canada
Phone: 6135482384
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2017


Corporation Name: C.M. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Parker ( CPSO# 74889 )

Business Address:
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 548-2384

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 12 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004