Parker, David John (CPSO#: 53894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 1609
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4794
Fax: (416) 586-8413
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lawrence Clinic
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 500
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 781-9500
Fax: (416) 781-7985
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Parker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Parker ( CPSO# 53894 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
1609 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4794

Business Address:
The University Health Network
4N484 - 585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-3141

Business Address:
The University Health Network - Western Division
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 586-4794

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Lawrence Clinic
Suite 500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 481-9500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1985