Parker, Kenneth John Medard (CPSO#: 58230)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 18 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Nov 1998