Parker, Thomas Gerard (CPSO#: 52745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
2-027 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5271
Fax: (416) 864-6034
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas G. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Parker ( CPSO# 52745 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS GERARD PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1984