Parker, Vivien Shue Wei (CPSO#: 89217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Tang, Vivien Shue Wei (used until: 23 Oct 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Booth Neurology
343 Booth Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7K1
Phone: (613) 233-3030
Fax: (613) 233-1061
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivien S.W. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Parker ( CPSO# 89217 )

Business Address:
Booth Neurology
343 Booth Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7K1
Phone Number: (613) 233-3030

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-5353

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIEN SHUE WEI PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013