Parkin, Doriana Maria (CPSO#: 82596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Oppedisano, Doriana Maria (used until: 28 Jun 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Market Lane Medical
Dental Office
Units 9/10
140 Woodbridge Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 2S7
Phone: (905) 850-0753
Fax: (866) 365-7615
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doriana Parkin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Parkin ( CPSO# 82596 )

Business Address:
Market Lane Medical
Dental Office
Units 9 & 10
140 Woodbridge Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 2S7
Phone Number: (905) 850-0079

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORIANA MARIA PARKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007