Parkinson, Lillian Marie (CPSO#: 59406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
88 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2H6
Phone: (905) 683-0690
Fax: (905) 683-1431
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lillian Parkinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Parkinson ( CPSO# 59406 )

Business Address:
88 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2H6
Phone Number: (905) 683-0690

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILLIAN MARIE PARKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKINSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1989