Parks, Donald Harry (CPSO#: 24194)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013