Parliament, Matthew Bruce (CPSO#: 53830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jan 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cross Cancer Institute
11560 University Avenue
Edmonton AB  T6G 1Z2
Phone: (780) 577-8148
Fax: (780) 432-8380

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW BRUCE PARLIAMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARLIAMENT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1990