Parlow, Joel Leonard (CPSO#: 53229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Anesthesiology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel Parlow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Providence Care
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL LEONARD PARLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARLOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983