Parmar, Hasmukh Premji (CPSO#: 78406)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Dar Es Salaam, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 06 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Mar 2010