Parna, Laura Mae Horner (CPSO#: 63660)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
119 Memorial Ave
Couchiching Familiy Health Team
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 326-3549
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

170 Colborne St W
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z2
Canada
Phone: (705) 325-2201
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parna-Gile Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Parna ( CPSO# 63660 )
Dr. D. Gile ( CPSO# 60676 )

Business Address:
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 326-1178

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colbourne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA MAE HORNER PARNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 13 Sep 1993 to 11 Mar 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1992