Parnes, Lorne Stephen (CPSO#: 51332)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital B1-333
Department Of Otolaryngology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3604
Fax: (519) 663-3916
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.S. Parnes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Parnes ( CPSO# 51332 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3604

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNE STEPHEN PARNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARNES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1985
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Mar 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1987