Parr, Kiersten Jane (CPSO#: 95486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins Family Health Team
Suite 250
123 3rd Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: (705) 268-7444
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kiersten Parr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Parr ( CPSO# 95486 )

Business Address:
Timmins District Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone Number: (705) 264-1313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIERSTEN JANE PARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013