Parra, Dimitri Alejandro Antonio (CPSO#: 83944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Feb 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Catholic University of Chile, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Radiology
Room #2172 A
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5286
Fax: (416) 813-2139
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Feb 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 03 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Feb 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Dimitri  Alejandro  Antonio  Parra  may practise medicine independently in
            Diagnostic Radiology.