Parrent, Andrew Gerard (CPSO#: 52797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3707
Fax: (519) 663-3753
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew G. Parrent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Parrent ( CPSO# 52797 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3707

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW GERARD PARRENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARRENT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Mar 1991
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1989