Parry, Debra Jane (CPSO#: 65942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1st Floor JT Powell Building
University of Guelph
Guelph, ON
N1G 2W1
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone: 5198244120 Ext. 52131
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 1995 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 18 Jan 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBRA JANE PARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jul 2016
Elective Trainee - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1993