Parry, Neil Geordie (CPSO#: 69883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Room E2-217
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6583
Fax: (519) 667-6546
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.G. Parry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Parry ( CPSO# 69883 )

Business Address:
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Room E2-217
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6583

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL GEORDIE PARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2003